CA SB869 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 651, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 651, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25645 of, and to add Section 25140, 25452, and 25612 to, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: securing handguns in vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB869 Hill Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 869 Hill Senate Third Reading By CHIU (Y: 61 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB869 Hill (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 869 Hill Senate Third Reading By CHIU (Y: 61 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB869 Hill (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 651, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 5325.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 17. Page 5881.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 29). |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-05-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 3535.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3313.) (March 29). |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 12. |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 25140 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 25452 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 25612 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 25645 | Amended Code | Citation Text |