CA SCR134 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 178, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 178, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to diabetes prevention.
Title
Diabetes: the "Screen at 23" campaign.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Assembly - SCR 134 Pan Senate Third Reading By LOW (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-30 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SCR134 Pan (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-30 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SCR134 Pan (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-09 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 178, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. |
2016-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6521.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | August 9 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4647.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-10 | Senate | Set for hearing June 20. |
2016-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4207.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Set for hearing June 8. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |