CO HB1043 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Enrollment For Early High School Grads
Title
Concurrent Enrollment For Early High School Grads
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.021 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.020 (Attachment G) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.021 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.020 (Attachment G) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1043, as amended, to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment to Amendment L.016 (Attachment A). Amend prepared Amendment L.016, page 3, line 19, strike "shall" and substitute "may"; line 22, strike the semi-colon after "concurrently" and substitute a period; line 22, strike (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.016 (Attachment A), as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1043, as amended, to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment to Amendment L.016 (Attachment A). Amend prepared Amendment L.016, page 3, line 19, strike "shall" and substitute "may"; line 22, strike the semi-colon after "concurrently" and substitute a period; line 22, strike (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.016 (Attachment A), as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1043, as amended, to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.010 (Attachment A) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.010 (Attachment A) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1043, as amended, to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.021 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.020 (Attachment G) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.021 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.020 (Attachment G) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1043, as amended, to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment to Amendment L.016 (Attachment A). Amend prepared Amendment L.016, page 3, line 19, strike "shall" and substitute "may"; line 22, strike the semi-colon after "concurrently" and substitute a period; line 22, strike (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.016 (Attachment A), as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1043, as amended, to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment to Amendment L.016 (Attachment A). Amend prepared Amendment L.016, page 3, line 19, strike "shall" and substitute "may"; line 22, strike the semi-colon after "concurrently" and substitute a period; line 22, strike (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.016 (Attachment A), as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1043, as amended, to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.010 (Attachment A) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.010 (Attachment A) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1043, as amended, to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-24 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-05-09 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2012-05-07 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2012-05-03 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-05-01 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-04-26 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-04-09 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education + Appropriations | |
2012-04-04 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-03 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-04-02 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-26 | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-27 | House Second Reading Re-referred w/Amend. to Education | |
2012-02-20 | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily with Amendments | |
2012-02-14 | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily | |
2012-02-13 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-02-08 | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |