CO HB1043 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modify Definition Of Deadly Weapon
Title
Modify Definition Of Deadly Weapon
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1043 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1043 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1043 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-03-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-12 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-02-11 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-07 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |