CO HB1043 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an extension of the scheduled repeal date for uniform commercial code filing fees to provide funding for the Colorado fraud investigators unit.
Title
Continue Funding Fraud Investigators Unit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1043 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Postpone House Bill 17-1043 indefinitely. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Reconsider Postpone House Bill 17-1043 indefinitely. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1043 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1043 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Postpone House Bill 17-1043 indefinitely. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Reconsider Postpone House Bill 17-1043 indefinitely. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1043 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1043 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-10 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |
2017-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-28 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-30 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |