CO HB1043 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-15 - House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-15 - House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a study of underground water storage to maximize the beneficial use of water within Colorado.
Title
Study Underground Water Storage Maximum Beneficial Use
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1043 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 21-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 21-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 21-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 21-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed |
2021-04-01 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-03-01 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Amended to Finance |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water |