CO HB1165 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-11)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-11)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning assistance for victims of strangulation who receive medical examinations.
Title
Assistance For Victims Of Strangulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1165, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1165, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1165 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1165, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1165, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1165 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-30 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-03-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-19 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |