CO HB1291 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modern Technology Education In Public Schools
Title
Modern Technology Education In Public Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1291 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1291 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1291 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1291 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1291 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1291 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1291, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1291, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1291, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1291 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1291 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1291 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1291 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1291 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1291, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1291, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1291, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2016-04-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-15 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-04-15 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-28 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2016-02-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |