CO HB1291 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning procedures for expulsion hearing officers, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Procedures For Expulsion Hearing Officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1291 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 23-1291 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1291, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 23-1291, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1291 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 23-1291 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1291, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 23-1291, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2023-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-04-28 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-20 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-04-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |