CO HB1312 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning modernizing immunization requirements for school entry to improve vaccination rates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Immunization Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1312 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Refer (ed) (Y: 21 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 25 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.047) (Y: 25 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.036) (Y: 25 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.050) (Y: 25 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.048) (Y: 25 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.037) (Y: 25 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.051) (Y: 25 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.052) (Y: 26 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-15 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1312, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-05-01SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-05-01SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2019-04-27HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-26HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-25HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-24HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-22HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-19HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-18HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-15HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1312
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1312_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1312_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1312_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b357c03a9c4600db872583dd006fe6db-hb19-1312-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1312vote33b7d8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1312vote33d2b0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1312vote338229
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1312vote333b5e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1312vote33228f
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1312vote339d50
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1312vote33609b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1312vote6c4768
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1312vote772fad
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1312vote70ce32
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/edc14c9a219af6c7872583ee000b4ff2-hb19-1312-0-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback