CO SB008 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Committee on Energy & Environment Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Committee on Energy & Environment Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the enhancement of penalties for criminal violations of water quality laws.
Title
Enhance Penalties Water Quality Criminal Violations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - House - House Energy & Environment: Postpone Senate Bill 20-008 indefinitely. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 20-008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 20-008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 20-008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 20-008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 20-008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 20-008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |