CO SB027 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning authorization for a county to use any lawful method to give final disposition to an unclaimed dead body.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County Authority Unclaimed Body Final Disposition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - House Judiciary: Postpone Senate Bill 19-027 indefinitely. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-027, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
2019-03-14HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2019-02-05HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Lay Over Amended
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-01-24SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-23SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-01-22SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-01-17SenateSenate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-027
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_027_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_027_en2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_027_rn2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/26add317b28753a887258385005cc5fd-sb19-027-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/26add317b28753a887258385005cc5fd-sb19-027-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-027vote5e3e1b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3658ed539f7329458725839800717b5c-sb19-027-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e1ca8c355f84b016872583da0000f8d6-sb19-027-0-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback