CO SB105 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Collateral Consequences
Title
Collateral Consequences
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.012 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-105, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely Senate Bill 12-105 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.012 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-105, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely Senate Bill 12-105 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-105, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.004 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.004 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-105, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-105, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.003 (Attachment K) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-105, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.003 (Attachment K) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-105, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-105, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely Senate Bill 12-105 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.012 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-105, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely Senate Bill 12-105 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-105, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.004 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.004 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-105, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-105, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.003 (Attachment K) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-105, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.003 (Attachment K) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-105, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely | |
2012-05-07 | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-05-07 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs | |
2012-05-04 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance | |
2012-01-31 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |