CO SB105 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning clarifying changes to provisions that were contained in House Bill 17-1367.
Title
Correction To House Bill 17-1367 Change "And" To "Or"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-105 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-105 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-105 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-105 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Governor Signed | |
2018-03-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-02-23 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-21 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 02/23/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-20 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 02/21/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-16 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-15 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/16/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-12 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |