CO SB106 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the ability of homeless youth to consent to shelter or shelter services.
Title
Consent To Shelter And Services By Homeless Youth
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 20-106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 20-106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 20-106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-11 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 20-106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 20-106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 20-106, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-26 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-05-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 06/01/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-11 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Lay Over Amended |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |