CO SB201 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designate Shelter & Rescue Dogs & Cats State Pets
Title
Designate Shelter & Rescue Dogs & Cats State Pets
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-201 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-201 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-201 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-201 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-201 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-201 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-201 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-26 | Senate | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-24 | Senate | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2013-04-04 | House | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-04 | House | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |