CO SB201 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the domestic violence offender management board, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations of the 2016 sunset report issued by the department of regulatory agencies.
Title
Sunset Domestic Violence Offender Management Board
Sponsors
Sen. John Cooke [R] | Sen. Rhonda Fields [D] | Sen. Pete Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-201 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-201 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-201 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-201 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-201, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-201, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-201 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-201 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-201 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-201 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-201, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-201, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-05-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-05 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-05-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-05-02 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-04-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |