CO SB201 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the application of child care licensing requirements for religious organizations for the time period during which services or programs are being offered.
Title
Religious Organization Child Care Licensing Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-201 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Postpone Senate Bill 18-201 indefinitely. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Postpone Senate Bill 18-201 indefinitely. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-04-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/12/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |