CO SJR017 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-22)
Status: Passed on April 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-22)
Status: Passed on April 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the Colorado legislative sportsmen's caucus, and, in connection therewith, designating April 18, 2024, as "Sportsmen's Day".
Title
Designate April 18 Colorado Sportsmen's Day 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-04-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/18/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |