CT HB05308 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-13 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-13 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a nonprofit workers' compensation insurance company to serve as the workers' compensation insurance carrier of last resort for employers in the state.
Title
An Act Establishing A Nonprofit Workers' Compensation Insurance Company.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2010-04-01 | File Number 275 | |
2010-04-01 | House Calendar Number 150 | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-01 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-26 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-17 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-16 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-03-05 | Public Hearing 03/09 | |
2010-02-23 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |