CT HB05308 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Senate Calendar Number 376
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Senate Calendar Number 376
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Department of Education to update the 2008 version of the department's framework for response to intervention entitled "Using Scientific Research-Based Interventions: Improving Education for All Students" and to establish a general education multitiered system of instruction and supports at each school for students requiring supplemental or intensive assistance.
Title
An Act Concerning Revisions To The Department Of Education's Framework For Response To Intervention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 29 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Senate Calendar Number 376 |
2016-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | House Passed |
2016-04-04 | House | File Number 403 |
2016-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 265 |
2016-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-16 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |