CT HB05308 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - File Number 118
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - File Number 118
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To protect consumers.
Title
An Act Concerning Consumer Protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | File Number 118 |
2021-03-24 | House | House Calendar Number 117 |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-09 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |