CT HB06540 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's highway safety program in accordance with federal requirements. Requested by the Department of Transportation.
Title
An Act Concerning Highway Safety, State Facility Traffic Authorities, Municipal Building Demolition, State Traffic Commission Certificates, At Grade Crossings, The Naming Of Roads And Bridges In Honor Or In Memory Of Persons And Organizations, And A Train Station In Niantic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 542 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 289 AS AMENDED (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 289 AS AMENDED (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-07-01 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-30 | Public Act 11-256 | |
2011-06-08 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-04 | Senate Calendar Number 651 | |
2011-06-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-06-04 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |
2011-06-04 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-04 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8387 | |
2011-06-02 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-06-02 | No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security | |
2011-06-02 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-06-02 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-06-02 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-27 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Safety and Security | |
2011-05-26 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-26 | No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | |
2011-05-26 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-26 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-26 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-24 | Referred by House to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | |
2011-05-18 | File Number 808 | |
2011-05-18 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-18 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-05-18 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-12 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/17/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-05-11 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-10 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-05-04 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-04-27 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-27 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-27 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-26 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-21 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-05 | File Number 393 | |
2011-04-05 | House Calendar Number 241 | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-05 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-29 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-21 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-18 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-10 | Public Hearing 03/14 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |