CT HB07005 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To permit ordained, commissioned and licensed members of the clergy to acknowledge parental statements concerning religious objections to vaccinations required for enrollment in public and nonpublic schools under the jurisdiction of local and regional boards of education, and to prohibit school nurses from acknowledging such statements.
Title
An Act Concerning The Development Of A Form To Be Used By Parents Who Object To Immunization On Religious Grounds And Notification To School Nurses Concerning Discretion In Acknowledging Such Objections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-01 | House | No New File by Committee on Education |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-30 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Education |
2019-03-28 | House | File Number 188 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 138 |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-01 | House | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |