CT HJ00238 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Bonnie E. Burr Of Brookfield To Be Reappointed A Member Of The State Board Of Education.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Bonnie E. Burr Of Brookfield To Be Reappointed A Member Of The State Board Of Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 119 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | In Concurrence |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 316 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Adopted, House |
2024-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 210 |
2024-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-04 | House | Public Hearing 04/02 |