CT SB00233 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To retain the regulation of maple syrup and honey production with the Department of Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Cottage Food Products And The Production Of Honey And Maple Syrup.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 245 AS AMENDED (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 84 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-06SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-06SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-05SenatePublic Act 19-18
2019-05-30SenateIn Concurrence
2019-05-30SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-30SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-29SenateHouse Calendar Number 511
2019-04-29SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-25SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-04-25SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A 7546
2019-04-25SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7546
2019-03-12SenateFile Number 47
2019-03-12SenateSenate Calendar Number 48
2019-03-12SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-12SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-06SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/19 5:00 PM
2019-02-26SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-02-25SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-01-30SenatePublic Hearing 02/04
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment
2019-01-28SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-01-25SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback