CT SB00972 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-29 - File Number 262
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-29 - File Number 262
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require a parent or guardian of a minor to accompany the minor to a tanning facility and require such parent or guardian to provide written consent to the minor's use of the tanning device after reviewing written materials concerning the health risks associated with the use of tanning devices.
Title
An Act Protecting Minors From The Health Risks Associated With The Use Of Tanning Devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | File Number 262 | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Calendar Number 178 | |
2011-03-29 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-03-29 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-15 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-15 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-09 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on General Law | |
2011-03-08 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on General Law | |
2011-03-08 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-07 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-07 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference General Law | |
2011-02-25 | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting | |
2011-02-17 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |