CT SB01067 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - House Calendar Number 517
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To establish a task force to analyze and make recommendations on the implementation of the laws governing dyslexia instruction and training.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Task Force To Analyze The Implementation Of Laws Governing Dyslexia Instruction And Training.

Sponsors

House Education Committee CommitteeSen. Catherine Osten [D]Rep. Terrie Wood [R]Rep. Lucy Dathan [D]
Sen. Robert Sampson [R]Sen. James Maroney [D]Rep. Kate Rotella [D]Rep. Themis Klarides [R]
Rep. Matt Blumenthal [D]Rep. Bill Simanski [R]Rep. Mitch Bolinsky [R]Rep. Jillian Gilchrest [D]
Sen. John Kissel [R]Rep. Robin Green [R]Rep. Noreen Kokoruda [R]Sen. Robert Duff [D]
Sen. Paul Formica [R]Sen. Kevin Witkos [R]Rep. Jeffrey Currey [D]Rep. Tami Zawistowski [R]
Sen. Leonard Fasano [R]Rep. David Michel [D]Sen. Will Haskell [D]Sen. Henri Martin [R]
Sen. Gary Winfield [D]Rep. J.P. Sredzinski [R]Rep. Nicole Klarides-Ditria [R]Rep. Christopher Rosario [D]
Rep. Devin Carney [R]Sen. Marilyn Moore [D]Rep. Michael Winkler [D]Rep. John Frey [R]
Rep. Vincent Candelora [R]Rep. Jason Rojas [D]Sen. Derek Slap [D]Sen. Norman Needleman [D]
Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R]Sen. Stephen Cassano [D]Rep. Brenda Kupchick [R]Rep. Michelle Cook [D]
Rep. Gail Lavielle [R]Sen. Julie Kushner [D]Sen. Carlo Leone [D]Sen. Tony Hwang [R]
Sen. George Logan [R]Rep. Raghib Allie-Brennan [D]Rep. Christopher Ziogas [D]Rep. Brian Lanoue [R]
Rep. Sean Scanlon [D]Rep. David Labriola [R]Rep. Holly Cheeseman [R]Sen. Eric Berthel [R]
Sen. John Fonfara [D]Rep. Kerry Szeps Wood [D]Sen. Kevin Kelly [R]Sen. Mae Flexer [D]
Rep. Christine Palm [D]Rep. Peter Tercyak [D]Sen. Alexandra Bergstein [D]Rep. Fred Camillo [R]
Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D]Rep. Cristin McCarthy Vahey [D]Rep. David Arconti [D]Rep. Russell Morin [D]
Rep. Timothy Ackert [R]Rep. Robert Sanchez [D]Rep. Pat Wilson Pheanious [D]Rep. Christine Conley [D]
Sen. Dan Champagne [R]Sen. Gennaro Bizzarro [R]Rep. Dorinda Keenan Borer [D]Rep. Rick Hayes [R]

Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 79 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateHouse Calendar Number 517
2019-04-29SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-25SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-04-25SenateSenate Passed
2019-04-10SenateFile Number 601
2019-04-10SenateSenate Calendar Number 285
2019-04-10SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-10SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-27SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-14SenatePublic Hearing 03/18
2019-03-13SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Education

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback