DC B20-0751 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - Act A20-0368 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 6930, Expires on Sep 25, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - Act A20-0368 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 6930, Expires on Sep 25, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2014 Revised Budget Request Emergency Adjustment Act Of 2014
Title
Fiscal Year 2014 Revised Budget Request Emergency Adjustment Act Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-28 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Council - Amendment (Bowser) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Council - Amendment (Bowser) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-11 | Council | Act A20-0368 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 6930, Expires on Sep 25, 2014 |
2014-06-27 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A20-0368, Expires on Sep 25, 2014 |
2014-06-26 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2014-06-12 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jun 26, 2014 |
2014-05-28 | Council | Amendment (Bowser) |
2014-05-09 | Council | Public Hearing on B20-0751 |
2014-04-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-04-08 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2014-04-03 | Council | B20-0751 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary |