DC B20-0904 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-26 - Act A20-0520 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 13104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-26 - Act A20-0520 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 13104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department Of Parks And Recreation Fee-based Use Permit Authority Clarification Act Of 2014
Title
Department Of Parks And Recreation Fee-based Use Permit Authority Clarification Act Of 2014
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - Second Reconsideration (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reconsideration (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - Second Reconsideration (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reconsideration (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-26 | Council | Act A20-0520 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 13104 |
2014-12-19 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2014-12-18 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A20-0520 |
2014-12-09 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 23, 2014 |
2014-12-02 | Council | Final Reading |
2014-11-18 | Council | First Reading CC |
2014-11-12 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B20-0904 |
2014-10-14 | Council | Public Hearing on B20-0904 |
2014-09-23 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2014-08-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-07-25 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0904 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-07-14 | Council | B20-0904 Introduced by Councilmember Cheh at Office of the Secretary |