DC B20-1020 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-26 - Act A20-0527 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 13119, Expires on Mar 18, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-26 - Act A20-0527 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 13119, Expires on Mar 18, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification No. 4 To Contract No. Cw24705 Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2014
Title
Modification No. 4 To Contract No. Cw24705 Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-26 | Council | Act A20-0527 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 13119, Expires on Mar 18, 2015 |
2014-12-19 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2014-12-18 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A20-0527, Expires on Mar 18, 2015 |
2014-12-09 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 23, 2014 |
2014-12-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2014-11-25 | Council | B20-1020 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary |