DC B21-0622 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-16 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-16 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill includes provisions that restrict the type of financial contributions that may be considered independent, and requires Political Action Committees (PACs) and independent expenditure committees to certify that received donations are non-coordinated; disallows unlimited contributions to PACs during years when the Committee is not supporting candidates in primary or general elections; prohibits businesses and individuals that have made financial contributions from entering into certain business relationships with the District; requires members of District boards and commissions to receive training from the Board of Ethics and Government Accountability at the start of their service; and requires employees to use either annual or unpaid leave when soliciting and receiving political contributions for a principal campaign or an exploratory committee.
Title
Campaign Finance Transparency And Accountability Amendment Act Of 2016
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-16 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-10-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2016-03-01 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-26 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0622 Published in the DC Register |
2016-02-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B21-0622 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/35347/B21-0622-Introduction.pdf |