DC B21-0816 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-07 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-07 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill dedicates the streets as shown on the Surveyors plats filed under S.O. 16-25908, and designates the streets as Burke Street, S.E.; C Street, S.E.; Massachusetts Avenue, S.E., and 20th Street, S.E.
Title
Dedication Of Land For Street Purposes In Square 1112e (s.o. 16-25908) Act Of 2016
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-10-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2016-07-12 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2016-07-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0816 Published in the DC Register |
2016-06-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B21-0816 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/36197/B21-0816-Introduction.pdf |