DC B21-0837 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-11 - Enacted with Act Number A21-0607
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-11 - Enacted with Act Number A21-0607
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill transfers certain District-owned real property in Ward 8 (Historic Anacostia) to the L'Enfant Trust for renovation and use development as workforce housing. The intended use of the property complies with historic preservation standards. The bill describes the real property as Lot 814 in Square 5779, Lot 849 in Square 5799, Lot 811 in Square 5800, and Lot 884 in Square 5765.
Title
Historic Preservation Of Derelict District Properties Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Vincent Orange [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - Amendment (May) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - Amendment (Bonds) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-01 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - Amendment (May) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - Amendment (Bonds) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-01 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-11 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0607 |
2016-12-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 10, 2017 |
2016-12-06 | Council | Amendment (Bonds) |
2016-12-06 | Council | Final Reading |
2016-12-06 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2016-12-06 | Council | Amendment (May) |
2016-11-15 | Council | Tabled Time Certain, 12-6-16 |
2016-11-01 | Council | First Reading |
2016-10-25 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-10-24 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0837 |
2016-10-06 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-09-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2016-07-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0837 Published in the DC Register |
2016-07-12 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Community Development |
2016-07-12 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |