DC B21-0901 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - Act A21-0524, Expires on January 29, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 13603
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - Act A21-0524, Expires on January 29, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 13603
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
With Outfront Media VW Communications LLC
Title
Contract No. Dcka-2012-c-0110 Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-11 - Council - Final reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-04 | Council | Act A21-0524, Expires on January 29, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 13603 |
2016-10-31 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0524 |
2016-10-31 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0524 |
2016-10-17 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 31, 2016 |
2016-10-11 | Council | Final reading |
2016-10-11 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2016-10-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |