DC B21-0928 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-25 - Act A21-0532, Expires on February 16, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 14338
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-25 - Act A21-0532, Expires on February 16, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 14338
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revised Wage Theft Prevention Clarification Emergency Amendment Act Of 2016
Title
Revised Wage Theft Prevention Clarification Emergency Amendment Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-11-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-25 | Council | Act A21-0532, Expires on February 16, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 14338 |
2016-11-18 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0532 |
2016-11-18 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0532 |
2016-11-04 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 21, 2016 |
2016-11-01 | Council | Final Reading |
2016-11-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2016-10-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |