DC B22-0451 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Law Number L22-0197 Effective from December 13, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Law Number L22-0197 Effective from December 13, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill modifies how "treatment" and "youth offender" are defined in the Youth Rehabilitation Amendment Act. It requires the Mayor to provide developmentally appropriate facilities, services, care, subsistence, education, treatment, training, segregation, and protection for youth offenders convicted of misdemeanor offenses and those pending trial or convicted of felony offenses. It also requires the Mayor to develop and submit to the Council a strategic plan for providing the facilities and services for youth offenders.
FUNDING NOTE - This law was passed Subject to Appropriations. See Bill 22-754 for funding certification.
Title
Youth Rehabilitation Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-10 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Council - Second Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Council - Second Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-13 | Council | Law Number L22-0197 Effective from December 13, 2018 |
2018-09-17 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2018-09-14 | Council | Act A22-0451 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 9554 |
2018-09-06 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0451 |
2018-08-21 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on September 5, 2018 |
2018-07-10 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-06-26 | Council | Second Reading |
2018-06-26 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Allen) |
2018-06-05 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-05-08 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-05-04 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0451 |
2017-10-26 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-09-29 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-09-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0451 Published in the DC Register |
2017-09-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-09-19 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |