DC B22-0466 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0124 Effective from July 3, 2018, Projected Law Date is June 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0124 Effective from July 3, 2018, Projected Law Date is June 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 22-124 makes clarifying amendments to the Fiscal Year 2018 Budget Support Act of 2017 as well as provisions in other law that support the Fiscal Year 2018 budget. It also provides funding for the collective bargaining agreement between the District of Columbia Public Schools and the Washington Teachers' Union as well as additional funding to District of Columbia public charter schools.
Title
Fiscal Year 2018 Budget Support Clarification Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Council | Law Number L22-0124 Effective from July 3, 2018, Projected Law Date is June 30, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is June 30, 2018 |
2018-05-11 | Council | Act A22-0343 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5091 |
2018-05-07 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0343 |
2018-05-07 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0343 |
2018-04-24 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 8, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-04-10 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2018-04-02 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-03-06 | Council | First Reading |
2018-03-06 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2018-02-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0466 |
2017-09-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0466 Published in the DC Register |
2017-09-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-09-19 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |