DC B22-1027 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - Act A22-0522, Expires on March 3, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13342
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - Act A22-0522, Expires on March 3, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13342
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifications Nos. 2 And 3 To Contract No. Cw56028 With Food & Friends, Inc. Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2018
Title
Modifications Nos. 2 And 3 To Contract No. Cw56028 With Food & Friends, Inc. Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-13 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-07 | Council | Act A22-0522, Expires on March 3, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13342 |
2018-12-03 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0522 |
2018-12-03 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0522 |
2018-11-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 5, 2018 |
2018-11-13 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-11-13 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-11-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |