DC B22-1039 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-14 - Act A22-0529, Expires on March 10, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13433
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-14 - Act A22-0529, Expires on March 10, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13433
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
New Communities Bond Authorization Emergency Amendment Act Of 2018
Title
New Communities Bond Authorization Emergency Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-27 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-14 | Council | Act A22-0529, Expires on March 10, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13433 |
2018-12-10 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0529 |
2018-12-10 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0529 |
2018-12-04 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 18, 2018 |
2018-11-27 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-11-20 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-11-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |