DC B23-0095 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-11 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-11 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it broadens the circumstances under which mandatory reporters (for suspected child abuse or neglect) must contact the authorities. It ads clergy and leaders of religious institutions to the list of mandatory reporters. It stiffens penalties for failure to report child abuse and requires training and certification for mandated reporters.
Title
Protecting Children Through Mandatory Reporting Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-06-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-02-01 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0095 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0095 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/41729/Introduction/B23-0095-Introduction.pdf |