DC B23-0117 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0566 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0566 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it broadens enforcement authority of underground facilities, such as gas and power lines to the Department of Consumer and Regulatory Affairs administratively. Currently, enforcement authority is limited to the District of Columbia Superior Court.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents".
Title
Underground Facilities Protection Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Council | Act A23-0566 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001024 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0566 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-15 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-12-01 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-11-24 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-18 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0117 |
2019-05-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-04-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-02-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0117 Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |