DC B23-0227 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Law L23-0050, Effective from Feb 21, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2469
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Law L23-0050, Effective from Feb 21, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2469
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 23-50 updates the ABC Board's enforcement powers including revoking a licensee’s license if the Board has cause to believe that the licensee has been evicted from or has otherwise vacated the licensed premises. It removes some burdensome requirements from internet licensees that are not in furtherance of peace, order, quiet, and public safety. It clarifies that unless otherwise authorized wholesalers and manufacturers are not permitted to sell alcoholic beverages to an unlicensed person and that wholesalers are required to store products in the District of Columbia for a minimum of 4 hours at the licensed location and keep inventory records. It also, among other things, requires the Office of Tax and Revenue to notify the Board when a licensee is the subject of a citation, revocation, or other enforcement action.
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Enforcement Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-03 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Council | Law L23-0050, Effective from Feb 21, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2469 |
2020-01-08 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-01-03 | Council | Act A23-0184 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9 |
2019-12-27 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-12-23 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0184 |
2019-12-12 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 27, 2019 |
2019-12-03 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-11-05 | Council | First Reading |
2019-10-23 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-10-16 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0227 |
2019-06-26 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-05-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0227 Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-03-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |