DC B23-0244 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-06 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-06 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it establishes a financial literacy education program. It requires that the Office of the State Superintendent of Education develop a financial literacy course to be piloted in all DC public high schools no later than the 2020-2021 school year.
Title
Financial Literacy Education in Schools Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-06 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-09-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0244 Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-04-02 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0244 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/42224/Introduction/B23-0244-Introduction.pdf |