DC B23-0305 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Act A23-0058 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7341, Expires on Sep 15, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Act A23-0058 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7341, Expires on Sep 15, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Legitimate Theater Sidewalk Cafe Authorization Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Legitimate Theater Sidewalk Cafe Authorization Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | Council | Act A23-0058 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7341, Expires on Sep 15, 2019 |
2019-06-18 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-06-17 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0058, Expires on Sep 15, 2019 |
2019-06-04 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 18, 2019 |
2019-06-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-05-28 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-05-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |