DC B23-0502 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 4 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-22 - Act A23-0165 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 15351, Expires on Feb 18, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on November 4 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-22 - Act A23-0165 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 15351, Expires on Feb 18, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2020 Budget Support Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Fiscal Year 2020 Budget Support Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-22 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-22 | Council | Act A23-0165 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 15351, Expires on Feb 18, 2020 |
2019-11-20 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A23-0165, Expires on Feb 18, 2020 |
2019-11-19 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-11-04 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 19, 2019 |
2019-10-22 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-10-22 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-10-21 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |