DC B23-0507 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-24 - Law L23-0120, Effective from Jun 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8981
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-24 - Law L23-0120, Effective from Jun 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8981
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 23-120 designates the National Capital Poison Center, located at 3201 New Mexico Avenue NW, Suite #310 Washington, DC 20016 as the District's poison control center.
Title
Poison Control Center Designation Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-24 | Council | Law L23-0120, Effective from Jun 24, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8981 |
2020-05-15 | Council | Act A23-0312 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5097 |
2020-05-12 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-05-05 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-04-27 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0312 |
2020-04-17 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 1, 2020 |
2020-04-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-03-03 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-02-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-01-29 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0507 |
2019-12-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-11-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-10-25 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0507 Published in the DC Register |
2019-10-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2019-10-22 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |