DC B23-0532 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-11 - Act A23-0505 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14399
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-11 - Act A23-0505 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14399
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-532 designates the 600 block of W Street, N.W., in Ward 1, as Dr. Montague Cobb Way.
Title
Dr. Montague Cobb Way Designation Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-10 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-10-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-11 | Council | Act A23-0505 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14399 |
2020-12-08 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-12-07 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0505 |
2020-11-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 8, 2020 |
2020-11-10 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-10-26 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-10-20 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-10-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0532 |
2020-09-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-08-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-29 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0532 Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-11-05 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |