DC B23-0931 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-13 - Act A23-0477 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13269, Expires on Jan 30, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-13 - Act A23-0477 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13269, Expires on Jan 30, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Marijuana Plant Count Elimination Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Medical Marijuana Plant Count Elimination Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-13 | Council | Act A23-0477 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13269, Expires on Jan 30, 2021 |
2020-11-03 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-11-02 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0477, Expires on Jan 30, 2021 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 3, 2020 |
2020-10-06 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-10-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-10-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |