DC B23-1019 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 29 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-25 - Returned from Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 29 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-25 - Returned from Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
UDC PR Harris Exclusive Use Repeal Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Title
UDC PR Harris Exclusive Use Repeal Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - Council - Postponed to 12/15/20 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - Council - Postponed to 12/15/20 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-25 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-14 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A23-0612, Expires on Apr 13, 2021 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-15 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-12-01 | Council | Postponed to 12/15/20 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-11-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |